No. 19-1305
Title:Wanda Vázquez-Garced, Governor of Puerto Rico, et al., Petitioners
v.
Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:May 20, 2020
Linked with 19A977
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2154)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2020Application (19A977) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2020 to April 16, 2020, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2020Application (19A977) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until April 16, 2020.
May 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020.
Jul 20 2020Brief of respondents The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 31 2020Reply of petitioners Hon. Wanda Vasquez-Garced, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William J. Sushon
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

wsushon@omm.com
(212)326-2000
Party name: Hon. Wanda Vasquez-Garced, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.