No. 19-1302 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
George Russell Kayer
Docketed:May 20, 2020
Linked with 19A923
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(09-99027)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2020Application (19A923) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2020 to April 16, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 21 2020Application (19A923) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 16, 2020.
May 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Jun 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2020 to August 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 19, 2020.
Aug 19 2020Brief of respondent George Kayer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Reply of petitioners David Shinn, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 15 2020Record Requested.
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 28 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit (3 boxes of state court records). The remaining record is available on PACER.
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lacey Stover Gard
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
400 West Congress Street
Bldg. S-215
Tucson, AZ 85701

lacey.gard@azag.gov
5206286654
Party name: David Shinn, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jean-Claude Andre
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
120 Broadway, Suite 300
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

jcandre@bclplaw.com
(310) 576-2148
Party name: George Kayer
Other
Kale Dylan Gans
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Idaho
708 W. State St., P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720

kale.gans@ag.idaho.gov
2083344152
Party name: Idaho, et al.