No. 19-1301
Title:Clyde S. Bovat, Petitioner
v.
Vermont
Docketed:May 20, 2020
Linked with 19A952
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Vermont
   Case Numbers:(2018-362)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2020Application (19A952) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 18, 2020 to May 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 27 2020Application (19A952) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 18, 2020.
May 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 10, 2020.
Jun 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 19 2020Brief amici curiae of The Rutherford Institute and Restore The Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 06 2020Brief of respondent Vermont in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 22 2020Reply of petitioner Clyde S. Bovat filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kirti Datla
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Kirti.datla@hoganlovells.com
2026376583
Party name: Clyde S. Bovat
Attorneys for Respondent
Erica Albin Marthage
    Counsel of Record
Bennington County State's Attorney
150 Veteran's Memorial Drive
Suite 10
Bennington, VT 05201

erica.marthage@vermont.gov
8024428116
Party name: Vermont
Other
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8406
Party name: National Association for Public Defense
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Dr.
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: Institute for Justice
Alex Campbell Hemmer
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

alex.hemmer@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6387
Party name: The Rutherford Institute and Restore The Fourth, Inc.