No. 19-1293 | |
Title: | Michael Ludwikowski, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | May 15, 2020 |
Linked with 19A932 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-1881) |
Decision Date: | December 5, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 19 2020 | Application (19A932) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 4, 2020 to May 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Feb 21 2020 | Application (19A932) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 3, 2020. |
May 04 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 27 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020. |
Jun 16 2020 | Response Requested. (Due July 16, 2020) |
Jul 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2020 to August 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2020. |
Aug 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 16, 2020. |
Sep 16 2020 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 22 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from September 30, 2020 to November 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 24 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 4, 2020 granted. |
Nov 02 2020 | Reply of petitioner Michael Ludwikowski filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 04 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020. |
Nov 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Lisa Ann Mathewson Counsel of Record | The Law Offices of Lisa A. Mathewson, LLC 123 S. Broad Street Suite 810 Philadelphia, PA 19109 lam@mathewson-law.com | 215-399-9592 |
Party name: Michael Ludwikowski | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jeffrey B. Wall Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |