No. 19-1291
Title:Charles Hamner, Petitioner
v.
Danny Burls, Warden, et al.
Docketed:May 14, 2020
Linked with 19A917
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2181)
   Decision Date:November 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2020Application (19A917) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 8, 2020 to May 7, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 19 2020Application (19A917) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until April 21, 2020.
May 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former Corrections Directors.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2020 to August 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 14, 2020.
May 20 2020Response to motion from respondent Danny Burls, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Clinics, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of John F. Stinneford filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 15 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors and Practitioners of Psychiatry, Psychology, and Medicine filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel M. Greenfield
    Counsel of Record
MacArthur Justice Center
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 E. Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611-3069

daniel-greenfield@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-8538
Party name: Charles Hamner
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Danny Burls, et al.
Other
Ruth Zemel Brown
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen Street, 3rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60607

ruth@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: Erwin Chemerinsky, Craig Futterman, Alan Mills, David Rudovsky, Joanna Schwartz,
Claudia Maria Flores
    Counsel of Record
Mandel Legal Aid Clinic, The University of Chicago Law School
6020 S. University Ave.
Chicago, IL 60637

cmflores@uchicago.edu
773-702-6498
Party name: Human Rights Clinics, Law Professors, and Non-Profit Organizations
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Professors and Practitioners of Psychiatry, Psychology, and Medicine
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: John F. Stinneford