No. 19-1284
Title:Malwarebytes, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Enigma Software Group USA, LLC
Docketed:May 13, 2020
Linked with 19A993
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17351)
   Decision Date:December 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2020Application (19A993) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 30, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Application (19A993) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 11, 2020.
May 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 12, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2020 to July 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 27, 2020.
Jun 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of ESET, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Cybersecurity Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Amicus brief of Internet Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2020Brief of respondent Enigma Software Group USA, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 12 2020Reply of petitioner Malwarebytes, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Malwarebytes, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Terry Budd
    Counsel of Record
Budd Law PLLC
120 Lyndhurst Circle
Wexford, PA 15090

terry.budd@buddlawglobal.com
14126132541
Party name: Enigma Software Group USA, LLC
Other
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Cybersecurity Experts
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: ESET, LLC
Ian Simmons
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye St., NW
Washington, DC 20006-4001

isimmons@omm.com
202-383-5106
Party name: TechFreedom
Brian Michael Willen
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Internet Association
Sophia Sabrina Cope
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

sophia@eff.org
(415) 436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation