No. 19-1280
Title:Idaho Department of Correction, et al., Petitioners
v.
Adree Edmo, aka Mason Edmo
Docketed:May 12, 2020
Linked with 19A1038
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35017, 19-35019)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2020Application (19A1038) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 13 2020Response to application (19A1038) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, May 18, by 4 p.m. ET
May 18 2020Response to application from respondent Adree Edmo filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2020Reply of applicants Idaho Department of Correction, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 21 2020Application (19A1038) referred to the Court.
May 21 2020Application (19A1038) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would grant the application.
May 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2020 to August 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2020.
Aug 10 2020Brief of Adree Edmo in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brady James Hall
    Counsel of Record
Moore Elia Kraft & Hall, LLP
702 West Idaho Street, Suite 800
Boise, ID 83702

brady@melawfirm.net
208-336-6900
Party name: Idaho Department of Correction, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lori Ellen Rifkin
    Counsel of Record
Rifkin Law Office
2855 Telegraph Ave, Suite 517
Berkeley, CA 94705

lrifkin@rifkinlawoffice.com
5104144132
Party name: Adree Edmo