No. 19-1279
Vide 19-1285
Title:Jake LaTurner, Kansas State Treasurer, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:May 12, 2020
Linked with 19A948
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1509, 2018-1510)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2020Application (19A948) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 10, 2020 to May 8, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 26 2020Application (19A948) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 8, 2020.
May 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jake LaTurner, Treasurer of the State of Kansas
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2020 to July 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2020.
Jun 11 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to July 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 17, 2020.
Jul 17 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 05 2020Reply of petitioner Jake LaTurner, Treasurer of the State of Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Jake LaTurner, Treasurer of the State of Kansas
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

supremectbriefs@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.