No. 19-1278
Title:Hunter Fussell, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:May 12, 2020
Linked with 19A961
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2019-KA-01061)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2020Application (19A961) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 10, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Application (19A961) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 9, 2020.
May 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Hiatt Pierson
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper US LLP
1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200
Dallas, TX 75201

adam.pierson@us.dlapiper.com
214-743-4512
Party name: Hunter Fussell