No. 19-1272
Title:Thomas Christopher Retzlaff, Petitioner
v.
Jason Lee Van Dyke
Docketed:May 8, 2020
Linked with 19A930
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40710)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2020Application (19A930) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 21 2020Application (19A930) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 3, 2020.
May 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2020Waiver of right of respondent Jason Lee Van Dyke to respond filed.
Main Document
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 08 2020Response Requested. (Due July 8, 2020)
Jun 26 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Blanket Consent
Jul 07 2020Brief of respondent Jason Lee Van Dyke in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 16 Media Organizations and Advocacy Groups.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 22, 2020 to August 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 17 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 5, 2020, granted.
Aug 04 2020Reply of petitioner Thomas Christopher Retzlaff filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
580 Massie Road
UVA Law School
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dortiz@law.virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Lee Van Dyke
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 2618
Decatur, TX 76234

jasonleevandyke@protonmail.com
9403059242
Party name: Jason Lee Van Dyke
Other
Thomas Carlton Arthur
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

thomas.c.arthur@gmail.com
404-606-0292
Party name: 16 Media Organizations and Advocacy Groups