No. 19-1269
Title:TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al., Petitioners
v.
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, et al.
Docketed:May 6, 2020
Linked with 19A931
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1363, 2018-1732)
   Decision Date:December 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2020Application (19A931) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Feb 24 2020Application (19A931) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 3, 2020.
Mar 18 2020Application of TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al. for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (March 23, 2020)
May 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 15 2020Amended proof of service filed with respect to petition for writ of certiorari filed by TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al.
Main Document
May 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2020 to July 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 29 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2020.
Jun 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of ACT | The App Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of u-blox Holding AG filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2020Brief amici curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance, Computer & Communications Industry Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Fair Standards Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2020Brief amici curiae of Twenty Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2020 to August 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 4, 2020.
Aug 04 2020Brief of respondents Ericsson, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Ericsson, Inc., et al.
Other
Samuel Bryant Davidoff
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

sdavidoff@wc.com
202-434-5648
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Alliance for Automotive Innovation, Google LLC, HTC Corporation
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
202-868-6915
Party name: Fair Standards Alliance
Thomas Knut Hedemann
    Counsel of Record
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP
90 State House Square, 9th Fl.
Hartford, CT 06103

thedemann@axinn.com
860 275 8145
Party name: u-blox Holding AG
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Mills Legal Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@law.stanford.edu
(650) 723-2465
Party name: Twenty Legal Scholars
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

bscarpelli@actonline.org
5175071446
Party name: ACT | The App Association