No. 19-1267
Title:Ford Motor Company of Canada, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
George Bell, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2020
Linked with 19A971
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A152295)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 2, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Application (19A971) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 1, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Application (19A971) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 1, 2020.
May 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Ford Motor Company of Canada, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph John Tabacco Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Berman Tabacco
44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650
San Francisco, CA 94104

jtabacco@bermantabacco.com
415-433-3200
Party name: George Bell, et al.