No. 19-1260
Title:Andrew Demma, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4143)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 20 2020Response Requested. (Due June 19, 2020)
Jun 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dawinder Singh Sidhu
    Counsel of Record
9636 Gudelsky Drive
Rockville, MD 20850

dss@umbc.edu
301-633-8313
Party name: Andrew Demma
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States