No. 19-1258
Vide 19-1257
Title:Arizona Republican Party, et al., Petitioners
v.
Democratic National Committee, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15845)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 20 2020Motion of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2020 to July 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2020, for all respondents.
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Elijah Haahr, et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Governor Douglas A. Ducey, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondents Democratic National Committee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 29 2020Reply of petitioners Arizona Republican Party, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.
Other
Bobby Burchfield
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bburchfield@kslaw.com
202-626-5524
Party name: Elijah Haahr, Paul Gazelka, David Ralston, Ron Ryckman, Brady Brammer, and Matt Simpson
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
2023313168
Party name: Governor Douglas A. Ducey, President of the Arizona State Senate Karen Fann, and Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Russell Bowers