No. 19-1257
Vide 19-1258
Title:Mark Brnovich, Attorney General of Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Democratic National Committee, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15845)
   Decision Date:January 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mark Brnovich, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 20 2020Motion of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2020 to July 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2020, for all respondents.
May 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Republican State Leadership Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Election Integrity Project California and Arizona filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Helen Purcell filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, and Project 21 filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky Secretary of State Michael Adams, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Elijah Haahr, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Maricopa County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Governor Douglas A. Ducey, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Senators Ted Cruz, Marsha Blackburn, John Cornyn, Tom Cotton, James M. Inhofe, James Lankford, And Mike Lee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Brief of respondents Democratic National Committee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 15, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 02 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until July 29, 2020, granted.
Jul 28 2020Reply of petitioner Mark Brnovich, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1258 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1257. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1257. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 26 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mark Brnovich, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Democratic National Committee, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including November 30, 2020. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including January 13, 2021. VIDED.
Nov 30 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed). VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 30 2020Brief of State Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Brief of Private Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Election Integrity Project California, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, Alabama, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute supporting neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Rights Union filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Nicholas Stephanopoulos in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Republican Governors Public Policy Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Helen Purcell in Support of Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Governor Douglas A. Ducey, President of the Arizona State Senate Karen Fann, and Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Russell Bowers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Legislators Elijah Haahr, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Senator Ted Cruz and Ten Other Members of the United States Senate filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Majority Leader Scott Fitzgerald and Speaker Robin Vos filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Governor Kristi Noem filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 2, 2021. VIDED.
Jan 06 2021Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Brief of respondents Democratic National Committee, et al. filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Brief of respondent Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of State And Local Election Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Navajo Nation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Voting Rights Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of North Carolina, Memphis, Central Virginia, and Miami-Dade Chapters of the A. Philip Randolf Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People and Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Senate Staffers and Other Leading Participants in the 1982 Amendments to the Voting Rights Act filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Empirical Elections Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and The American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Travis Crum filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Casper Sleep Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Fair Fight Action, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Mi Familia Vota, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 25 2021Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 25 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 25 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 28 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 12 2021Reply of petitioners Mark Brnovich, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Reply of petitioners Arizona Republican Party, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2021Letter from the Acting Solicitor General notifying the Court of the updated position of the United States' from that presented in its amicus curiae brief filed on December 7, 2020 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 24 2021USDC, D. Ariz. plaintiffs' exhibits electronically received. VIDED.
Feb 24 2021USDC, D. of Ariz., defendants' exhibits electronically received. VIDED.
Mar 02 2021Argued. For petitioners in 19-1258: Michael A. Carvin, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 19-1257: Mark Brnovich, Attorney General, Phoenix, Ariz. For respondent Secretary Hobbs: Jessica R. Amunson, Washington, D. C. For respondents DNC, et al.: Bruce V. Spiva, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-7643
Party name: Arizona Republican Party, et al.
Joseph Andrew Kanefield
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

allyson.flanagan@azag.gov
6025428017
Party name: Mark Brnovich, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.
Bruce V. SpivaPerkins Coie LLP
700 13th St NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

bspiva@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6203
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.
Other
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington St.
Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@electionlawcenter.com
317-203-5599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation et al.
Debo P. Adegbile
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-295-6717
Party name: The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights et al
Leah Camille Aden
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Ed. Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St.
Fifth Floor
New York, NY 10006

laden@naacpldf.org
2129652200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia, et al.,
Jessie Ann Augustyn
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin State Senate
1 East Main Street
Room 131 South
Madison, WI 53703

jessie.augustyn@legis.wi.gov
6082665660
Party name: Wisconsin Majority Leader Scott Fitzgerald and Speaker Robin Vos
W. Scott Bales
    Counsel of Record
Scott Bales LLC
3219 E. Camelback Road, #432
Phoenix, AZ 85018

scott@sbales.com
6028828536
Party name: Fair Fight Action, Inc. and Arizona Voter Empowerment Task Force
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Senator Ted Cruz and Ten Other Members of the United States Senate
Laura W. Brill
    Counsel of Record
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd.
Suite 1725
Los Angeles, CA 90067

lbrill@kbkfirm.com
310-556-2700
Party name: Senate Staffers and Other Leading Participants in the 1982 Amendments to the Voting Rights Act
Bobby Burchfield
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bburchfield@kslaw.com
202-626-5524
Party name: Elijah Haahr, Paul Gazelka, David Ralston, Ron Ryckman, Brady Brammer, and Matt Simpson
David James Cantelme
    Counsel of Record
Cantelme & Brown PLC
2020 S. McClintock Drive
Suite 109
Tempe, AZ 85282

david@cb-attorneys.com
602 200 0104
Party name: Helen Purcell in Support of Petitioners
H. Christopher Coates
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of H. Christopher Coates
934 Compass Point
Charleston, SC 29412

curriecoates@gmail.com
(843) 609-7080
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Jacqueline Diana De Leon
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1506 Broadway
Boulder, CO 80302

JDeLeon@narf.org
3034478760
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
2101 L Street N.W.
Washington, DC, DC 20037

drayed@gtlaw.com
(202) 331-3168
Party name: Governor Douglas A. Ducey, President of the Arizona State Senate Karen Fann, and Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Russell Bowers
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Professor Travis Crum
Judith M. Dworkin
    Counsel of Record
Sacks Tierney P.A.
4250 N. Drinkwater Boulevard
Fourth Floor
Scottsdale, AZ 85251

judith.dworkin@sackstierney.com
480-425-2615
Party name: Navajo Nation in Support of Respondent
Nathaniel Bruce Edmonds
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

nathanieledmonds@paulhastings.com
202-551-1700
Party name: Casper Sleep Inc. With Over 250 Business Leaders
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, and West Virginia
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey Matthew HarrisConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
101 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2071
Party name: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People and Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Jenna Adrith Hudson
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert LLP
700 Pennsylvania Ave SE
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20003

hudsonj@gilbertlegal.com
(202) 772-3966
Party name: Professor Nicholas Stephanopoulos
Christopher Matthew Kieser
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ckieser@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, and Project 21
Jason A. Leckerman
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street
51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

LeckermanJ@ballardspahr.com
(215) 665-8500
Party name: Mi Familia Vota, Arizona Center For Empowerment, Chispa Arizona, League of Women Voters of Arizona
Justin Michael Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Loyola Law School
919 Albany Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015

justin.levitt@lls.edu
213-736-7417
Party name: Voting Rights Scholars
Thomas Purcell Liddy
    Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Attorney's Office
222 North Central Avenue
Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004

liddyt@mcao.maricopa.gov
602.506.8541
Party name: Maricopa County
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Drive, Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jlienhard@hvjt.law
15403418809
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Office of the Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky Secretary of State Michael Adams, Louisiana Secretary of State R. Kyle Ardoin, and Missouri Secretary of State John R. Ashcroft
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

mike@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6105
Party name: Election Integrity Project California, et al.,
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Rights Union
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Union
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Suite 2200
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Maxwell Vaughn Pritt
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
44 Montgomery Street, 41st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

mpritt@bsfllp.com
(415) 293-6800
Party name: Empirical Elections Scholars
Davin McKay Rosborough
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.
915 15th Street NW, 6th Floor
Washington, DC 20005-2313

drosborough@aclu.org
7033800804
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and The American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: North Carolina, Memphis, Central Virginia, and Miami-Dade Chapters of the A. Philip Randolf Institute
Antony L. Ryan
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

aryan@cravath.com
212-474-1296
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Governor Kristi Noem
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center
Charles Robert Spies
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1825 Eye Street NW
STE 900
Washington, DC 20006

cspies@dickinsonwright.com
202-466-5964
Party name: Republican State Leadership Committee
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suire 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
4145881658
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy.
Haymarket, VA 20169

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Republican Governors Public Policy Committee
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: State And Local Election Officials
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
370 17th Street
Suite 4500
Denver, CO 80202

yarger@wtotrial.com
3032441800
Party name: Legislators Elijah Haahr, et al.