No. 19-1255
Title:Renee Baker, Warden, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jeff N. Rose
Docketed:April 30, 2020
Linked with 19A915
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15009)
   Decision Date:September 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2020Application (19A915) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 24, 2020 to March 25, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2020Application (19A915) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 25, 2020.
Apr 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2020 to July 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

hstern@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: Renee Baker, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Amelia L. Bizzaro
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Nevada
411 E. Bonneville Avenue
Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101

amelia_bizzaro@fd.org
7023886577
Party name: Jeff N. Rose