No. 19-1254
Title:Pennsylvania, Petitioner
v.
Joseph J. Davis
Docketed:April 29, 2020
Linked with 19A900
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(56 MAP 2018)
   Decision Date:November 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2020Application (19A900) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Feb 14 2020Application (19A900) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Application (19A900) to extend further the time from March 19, 2020 to April 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written Request
Mar 12 2020Application (19A900) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 16, 2020.
Apr 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 29, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to July 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 28, 2020.
May 26 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2020Brief of respondent Joseph Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Ross Stoycos
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General
16th Floor Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

wstoycos@attorneygeneral.gov
484-467-7395
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Attorneys for Respondent
Peter Goldberger
    Counsel of Record
50 Rittenhouse Place
Ardmore, PA 19003

peter.goldberger@verizon.net
610-649-8200
Party name: Joseph Davis
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah