No. 19-1241
Vide 19-1231
Title:National Association of Broadcasters, et al., Petitioners
v.
Prometheus Radio Project, et al.
Docketed:April 22, 2020
Linked with 19A889
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1107, 17-1109, 17-1110, 17-1111, 18-1092, 18-1669, 18-1670, 18-1671, 18-2943, 18-3335)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2020Application (19A889) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Application (19A889) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2020.
Mar 09 2020Application (19A889) to extend further the time from March 19, 2020 to April 18, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 12 2020Application (19A889) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 18, 2020.
Apr 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2020 to July 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 21, 2020.
May 12 2020Motion of Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, et al. to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2020 to July 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 21, 2020, for all respondents.
May 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Gray Television, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 22 2020Brief amici curiae of ABC Television Affiliates Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of The International Center for Law and Economics filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent Independent Television Group to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 21 2020Brief of respondents Prometheus Radio Project, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Waiver of right of respondents Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council and the National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 30 2020Motion of petitioners to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 5, 2020 to August 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 03 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 19, 2020, granted.
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 19 2020Reply of petitioners National Association of Broadcasters, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1231 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1231. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1231. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3599
Party name: National Association of Broadcasters
Attorneys for Respondents
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Prometheus Radio Project; Media Mobilizing Project; Free Press; Office of Communication, Inc. of the United Church of Christ, et al.
Jack N. Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack N Goodman
1200 New Hampshire Ave, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

jack@jackngoodman.com
2027762045
Party name: Independent Television Group
Dennis Lane
    Counsel of Record
Stinson LLP
1775 Pennsylvania Ave., NW. Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

dennis.lane@stinson.com
202572-9906
Party name: Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council and the National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, Inc.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Other
William J. Kolasky Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
1775 "I" Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

kolasky@hugheshubbard.com
202-721-4771
Party name: The International Center for Law and Economics
David Edward Mills
    Counsel of Record
Suite 500
1255 23rd Street
Washington, DC 20037

dmills@cooley.com
2028427800
Party name: Gray Television, Inc.
Mark J. Prak
    Counsel of Record
Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey and Leonard LLP
1600 Wells Fargo Capitol Center
150 Fayetteville Street
Raleigh, NC 27601

mprak@brookspierce.com
(919) 839-0300
Party name: ABC Television Affiliates Association, CBS Television Network Affiliates Association, FBC Television Affiliates Association, and NBC Television Affiliates
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
    Counsel of Record
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
1341 G Steet NW
Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20005

andyschwartzman@gmail.com
2022412408
Party name: Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, National Hispanic Media Coalition, National Organization for Women Foundation, Media Alliance and Media Counsel Hawai’i.