No. 19-1231
Vide 19-1241
Title:Federal Communications Commission, et al., Petitioners
v.
Prometheus Radio Project, et al.
Docketed:April 20, 2020
Linked with 19A879
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1107, 17-1109, 17-1110, 17-1111, 18-1092, 18-1669, 18-1670, 18-1671, 18-2943, 18-3335)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2020Application (19A879) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2020 to March 19, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Application (19A879) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 19, 2020.
Mar 09 2020Application (19A879) to extend further the time from March 19, 2020 to April 18, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Proof of ServiceWritten Request
Mar 11 2020Application (19A879) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 18, 2020.
Apr 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
May 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2020 to July 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 21, 2020.
May 12 2020Motion of Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, et al. to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2020 to July 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 21, 2020, for all respondents.
May 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Gray Television, Inc. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent Independent Television Group to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 21 2020Brief of respondents Prometheus Radio Project; et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Waiver of right of Lane, Dennis Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council and the National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020Reply of petitioners FCC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: FCC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Prometheus Radio Project; Media Mobilizing Project; Free Press; Office of Communication, Inc. of the United Church of Christ, et al.
Jack N. Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack N Goodman
1200 New Hampshire Ave, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

jack@jackngoodman.com
2027762045
Party name: Independent Television Group
Dennis Lane
    Counsel of Record
Stinson LLP
1775 Pennsylvania Ave., NW. Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

dennis.lane@stinson.com
202-572-9906
Party name: Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council and the National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, Inc.
Other
David Edward Mills
    Counsel of Record
Suite 500
1255 23rd Street
Washington, DC 20037

dmills@cooley.com
2028427800
Party name: Gray Television, Inc.
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
    Counsel of Record
Andrew Jay Schwartzman
1341 G Steet NW
Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20005

andyschwartzman@gmail.com
2022412408
Party name: Benton Institute for Broadband & Society, National Hispanic Media Coalition, National Organization for Women Foundation, Media Alliance and Media Counsel Hawai’i.