No. 19-1222
Title:Nathan Duckworth, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 16, 2020
Linked with 19A795
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3201)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2020Application (19A795) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2020 to April 11, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Application (19A795) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 13, 2020.
Apr 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to May 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2020.
May 21 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Reply of petitioner Nathan Duckworth filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Nathan Duckworth
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States