No. 19-1221
Title:Derrick Lucius Williams, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 16, 2020
Linked with 19A863
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1299)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2020Application (19A863) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2020 to April 12, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Application (19A863) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 13, 2020.
Apr 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to June 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2020.
Jun 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2020 to June 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 19, 2020.
Jun 19 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Reply of petitioner Derrick Lucius Williams, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 08 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Derrick Lucius Williams, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Derrick Lucius Williams, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America