No. 19-1220
Title:Istvan Szonyi, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:April 16, 2020
Linked with 19A816
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-73514)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2020Application (19A816) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2020 to April 10, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 22 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 24 2020Application (19A816) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 10, 2020.
Apr 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2020)
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to June 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
May 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2020.
May 18 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Jun 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2020 to July 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 17, 2020.
Jul 17 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Aug 04 2020Reply of petitioner Istvan Szonyi filed. (Distributed)
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Timothy Raimer
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

dtraimer@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Istvan Szonyi
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William P.
Other
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

odunford@pacificlegal.org
561.691.5000
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation