No. 19-122
Title:David Thompson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Heather Hebdon, Executive Director of the Alaska Public Offices Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 25, 2019
Linked with 18A1132
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-35019)
   Decision Date:November 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2019Application (18A1132) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 21, 2019 to June 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 03 2019Application (18A1132) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 20, 2019.
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1132) to extend further the time from June 20, 2019 to July 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 06 2019Application (18A1132) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 20, 2019.
Jul 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2019 to September 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019Letter of August 8, 2019, regarding substitution of parties under Rule 35 received from counsel for the respondents.
Main Document
Aug 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 25, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Republican Senatorial Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and the Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: David Thompson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Laura Frances Fox
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Department of Law
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

laura.fox@alaska.gov
9072695275
Party name: Heather Hebdon, et al.
Other
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Cato Institute and the Institute for Justice
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: The National Republican Senatorial Committee and National Republican Congressional Committee