No. 19-1214
Title:Marty Friend, Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:April 14, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(18A-CR-02359)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 23, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2020Motion of State of Indiana for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 11, 2020 - amended motion submitted)
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2020.
May 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Brief of State of Indiana in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Marty Friend
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Other
Benjamin Paul Chagnon
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

bchagnon@orrick.com
202-339-8669
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers