No. 19-1212
Title:Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Innovation Law Lab, et al.
Docketed:April 14, 2020
Linked with 19A960
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15716)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2020Application (19A960) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Response to application (19A960) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, March 9, by 4 p.m. ET.
Mar 09 2020Response to application from respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Reply of applicants Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) referred to the Court.
Mar 11 2020Application (19A960) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted, and the district court’s April 8, 2019 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.
Apr 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 14, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 22 2020Application of Innovation Law Lab, et al. for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 23, 2020 - Corrected response extension request to be filed)
Apr 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2020 to June 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
May 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2020 to July 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 15, 2020.
Jul 15 2020Brief of respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 29 2020Reply of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition GRANTED.
Nov 23 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 8, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 13, 2021.
Dec 08 2020Joint appendix (two volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Brief of petitioners Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 1, 2021.
Jan 05 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2021.
Jan 15 2021Brief of respondents Innovation Law Lab, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Nongovernmental Organizations and Law School Clinics filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mila Sohoni filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Amicus brief of American Statistical Association not accepted for filing. (January 27, 2021 - to be reprinted and resubmitted)
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Statistical Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Immigration and International Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of The Laredo Project and the National Immigrant Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Young Center for Immigrant Children’s Rights, et al., filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Citizenship and Immigration Services Council 119 filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., and Catholic Charities USA filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 28 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 01 2021Motion to hold further briefing in abeyance and remove the case from the February 2021 argument calendar filed by petitioners. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 03 2021Motion to hold further briefing in abeyance and remove the case from the February 2021 argument calendar GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judy Rabinovitz
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

JRabinovitz@aclu.org
(212) 549-2618
Party name: Innovation Law Lab, et al.
Other
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts
Linda Dakin-Grimm
    Counsel of Record
Milbank LLP
2029 Century Park East, 33rd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

LDakin-Grimm@milbank.com
(424) 386-4000
Party name: Young Center for Immigrant Children’s Rights, et al.,
Christopher Egleson
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

cegleson@sidley.com
(213) 896-6108
Party name: Mila Sohoni
Muhammad Usman Faridi
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mfaridi@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: National Citizenship and Immigration Services Council 119
Ilana Beth Gelfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
100 High Street
Boston, MA 02110

igelfman@jonesday.com
(617) 960-3939
Party name: The Laredo Project and the National Immigrant Justice Center
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Nongovernmental Organizations and Law School Clinics
Jason Albert Leonard
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
390 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017

jason.leonard@hoganlovells.com
2129183782
Party name: American Statistical Association
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., and Catholic Charities USA
Ana Cecilia Reyes
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

areyes@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Immigration and International Law Scholars
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612

msungaila@buchalter.com
(949) 760-1121
Party name: American Bar Association