No. 19-1208 | |
Title: | Erika Jisela Yanez-Pena, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | April 10, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-60464) |
Decision Date: | February 28, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 08 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2020) |
Apr 08 2020 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filng system. |
May 01 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2020 to June 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 04 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2020. |
May 11 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Thirty-Six Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals filed. |
May 11 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Immigrant Advocates Response Collaborative filed. |
Jun 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2020 to July 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Jun 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 10, 2020. |
Jul 10 2020 | Memorandum of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. |
Jul 24 2020 | Reply of petitioner Erika Jisela Yanez-Pena filed. |
Jul 29 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Apr 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021. |
May 03 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Niz-Chavez v. Garland, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). |
Jun 04 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Raed Gonzalez Counsel of Record | Gonzalez Olivieri, LLC 2200 Southwest Freeway Suite 550 Houston, TX 77098 rgonzalez@gonzalezolivierillc.com | 713-481-3040 |
Party name: Erika Jisela Yanez-Pena | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General | ||
Other | ||
Sari M. Alamuddin Counsel of Record | Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP 77 West Wacker Drive Fifth Floor Chicago, IL 60601 sari.alamuddin@morganlewis.com | 312-324-1000 |
Party name: Immigrant Advocates Response Collaborative | ||
Richard W. Mark Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 200 Park Avenue New York, NY 10166 RMark@gibsondunn.com | (212) 351-3818 |
Party name: Thirty-Six Former Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals |