No. 19-1201
Title:Clay Bright, Tennessee Commissioner of Transportation, Petitioner
v.
William Harold Thomas, Jr.
Docketed:April 8, 2020
Linked with 19A814
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6238)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2020Application (19A814) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Application (19A814) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 3, 2020.
Apr 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2020 to May 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2020.
May 22 2020Brief of respondent William Thomas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
War Memorial Building
301 6th Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Clay Bright, Commissioner of Tennessee Department of Transportation
Attorneys for Respondent
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

adickerson@ifs.org
(202) 301-9000
Party name: William Thomas