No. 19-1195
Title:Adalberto Frickson Palacios-Solis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14294)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2020.
May 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2020 to June 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 8, 2020.
May 29 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Adalberto Palacios-Solis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States