No. 19-1194
Title:Jiahao Kuang, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Defense, et al.
Docketed:April 2, 2020
Linked with 19A808
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17381)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2020Application (19A808) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Application (19A808) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 30, 2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2020 to June 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2020.
May 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Modern Military Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2020 to August 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 14, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Jiahao Kuang, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of Defense, et al.
Other
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Modern Military Association of America, et al.