No. 19-1191 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ohio, Petitioner
v.
Shawn Ford
Docketed:April 1, 2020
Linked with 19A753
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2015-1309)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Application (19A753) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Application (19A753) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 3, 2020.
Mar 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2020 to June 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2020.
Apr 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2020Brief amici curiae of The States Of Texas, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, And Utah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2020Brief of respondent Shawn Ford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 12 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Shawn Ford.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 19 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
May 19 2020Reply of petitioner State of Ohio filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio
Attorneys for Respondent
Rachel Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215

rachel.troutman@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-9323
Party name: Shawn Ford
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: The States Of Texas, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, And Utah
Katherine Elizabeth Mullin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cuyahoga County Prosecutor
1200 Ontario Street, 8th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44113

kemullin@prosecutor.cuyahogacounty.us
2166986454
Party name: Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association