No. 19-1189
Title:BP p.l.c., et al., Petitioners
v.
Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Docketed:March 31, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1644)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, BP p.l.c., et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Response to motion from petitioner BP p.l.c., et al. filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2020Reply in support of motion from respondent filed.
Main Document
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020.
Apr 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Energy Policy Advocates filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 13 2020Letter of May 13, 2020 from the Solicitor General of Louisiana respecting the brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. received.
Main Document
Jun 29 2020Brief of respondent Mayor and City Council of Baltimore in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 15 2020Reply of petitioners BP p.l.c., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Oct 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, BP p.l.c., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 22 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Blanket Consent
Nov 16 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Brief of petitioners BP p.l.c., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Nov 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Richard B. Myers and Michael G. Mullen filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Energy Policy Advocates filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Nov 25 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 19, 2021.
Dec 03 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Dec 08 2020CIRCULATED
Dec 11 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 16 2020Brief of respondent Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Brief amici curiae of State and Local Government Groups filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Chesapeake Bay Foundation and Natural Resources Defense Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Senators Whitehouse, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Erwin Chemerinsky, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Amicus brief of Boulder County, San Miguel County, and the City of Boulder, Colorado submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jan 08 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Jan 08 2021Reply of petitioners BP p.l.c., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: BP p.l.c., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Victor M. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Edling LLP
100 Montgomery St.
Suite 1410
San Francisco, CA 94104

vic@sheredling.com
628-231-2500
Party name: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Other
Tristan L. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
2555 Grand Boulevard
Kansas City, MO 64108

tlduncan@shb.com
816-559-2040
Party name: Richard B. Myers and Michael G. Mullen
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Ian Michael Fein
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 21st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ifein@nrdc.org
(415) 875-6147
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Matthew Daniel Hardin
    Counsel of Record
1725 I Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

MatthewDHardin@gmail.com
202-802-1948
Party name: Energy Policy Advocates
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: American Petroleum Institute
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd LLP
1500 Warner Building
150 Ottawa Avenue NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: DRI - Voice of the Defense Bar
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: State and Local Government Groups
William A. Rossbach
    Counsel of Record
Rossbach Law, PC
P. O. Box 8988
Missoula, MT 59802

bill@rossbachlaw.com
406-543-5156
Party name: Erwin Chemerinsky, Andrew D. Bradt, Helen Hershkoff, Lonny Hoffman, E. Farish Percy, Michael E. Solimine, Adam N. Steinman, Joan Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Rhonda Wasserman and Anne Bloom
Marco Benjamin Simons
    Counsel of Record
EarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
#800
Washington, DC 20006

marco@earthrights.org
202-466-5188
Party name: Boulder County, San Miguel County, and the City of Boulder, Colorado
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger & Associates
13250 Branch View Lane
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
5105314529
Party name: Senators Whitehouse, Cardin, Blumenthal, Warren, Markey, and Van Hollen
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8020
Party name: States of New York, Rhode Island et al.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Ohio, South Carolina, Texas, and Utah