No. 19-1184
Title:Nikki Bruni, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:March 30, 2020
Linked with 19A838
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1084)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2020Application (19A838) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 25, 2020 to March 26, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 27 2020Application (19A838) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 26, 2020.
Mar 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Nikki Bruni, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2020 to July 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2020Amicus brief of The National Legal Foundation, et al. not accepted for filing. (April 29, 2020)
Apr 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 27, 2020
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 16 Other States filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eleanor McCullen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Forty Days for Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Pro-Life Union of Greater Philadelphia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Amicus brief of Life Legal Defense Foundation not accepted for filing. (May 19, 2020)(Corrected submitted)
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation filed. (5/15/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Waiver of City of Pittsburgh, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (July 14, 2020)
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 15 2020Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2020)
Oct 15 2020Brief of City of Pittsburgh, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Nikki Bruni, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Edwin Kennedy
    Counsel of Record
City of Pittsburgh Law Department- Associate City Solicitor
414 Grant Street
Third Floor, City County Building
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

michael.kennedy@pittsburghpa.gov
4122552025
Party name: City of Pittsburgh, et al.
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Stephen M. Crampton
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington St., Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

smcrampton@hotmail.com
6622559439
Party name: Forty Days for Life, Pro-Life Action League, Sidewalk Advocates for Life, Pro-Life Action Ministries, Pro-Life Wisconsin
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Douglas Law PLLC
106 East 8th Street
Holland, MI 49423

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: Constitutional Law Professors
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 16 Other States
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 1313
Ojai, CA 93024-1313

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 337-6880
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
119 South Monroe Street
Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL 32301

edw@hgslaw.com
850-425-2352
Party name: Eleanor McCullen
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: The Pro-Life Union of Greater Philadelphia