No. 19-1181
Title:Estate of Thomas Steinbeck, et al., Petitioners
v.
Waverly Scott Kaffaga, as Executrix of the Estate of Elaine Anderson Steinbeck
Docketed:March 30, 2020
Linked with 19A737
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55336)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2020Application (19A737) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2020 to March 10, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Application (19A737) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2020.
Mar 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Waiver of Waverly Scott Kaffaga not accepted for filing. (March 19, 2020)
Apr 21 2020Waiver of right of respondent Waverly Scott Kaffaga to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Apr 29 2020Amicus brief of The Estate of Thomas Steinbeck, et al. not accepted for filing. (April 29, 2020)
Apr 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Authors Guild Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of California Society of Entertainment Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 06 2020Response Requested. (Due June 5, 2020)
May 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2020 to July 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2020.
Jun 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 06 2020Brief of respondent Waverly Scott Kaffaga in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 23 2020Reply of The Estate of Thomas Steinbeck, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-559-9175
Party name: The Estate of Thomas Steinbeck, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Susan J. Kohlmann
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
919 Third Avenue
38th Floor
New York, NY 10022

skohlmann@jenner.com
212-891-1690
Party name: Waverly Scott Kaffaga
Other
Raymond J. Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dunnington Bartholow & Miller LLP
230 Park Avenue
21st Floor
New York, NY 10169

rdowd@dunnington.com
212-682-8811
Party name: Authors Guild Inc., Dramatists Guild of America, Inc., The American Society of Journalists and Authors, Ralph Oman
David Albert Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Law Group LLP
9100 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 225 East
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

david@piercellp.com
3102749191
Party name: California Society of Entertainment Lawyers
Anthony H. Son
    Counsel of Record
Maddox Edwards PLLC
1900 K Street, N.W.
Suite 725
Washington, DC 20006

ason@meiplaw.com
2028301494
Party name: Digital Justice Foundation