No. 19-1176
Title:Jim Yovino, Fresno County Superintendent of Schools, Petitioner
v.
Aileen Rizo
Docketed:March 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15372)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2020 to June 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including May 27, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Society for Human Resource Management filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2020Brief of Aileen Rizo in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 29, 2020) (Corrected verison submitted).
May 27 2020Brief of respondent Aileen Rizo in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2020Reply of Fresno County Superintendent of Schools not accepted for filing. (June 02, 2020 - Corrected brief to be submitted)
Jun 01 2020Reply of petitioner Fresno County Superintendent of Schools filed. (Distributed)(6/3/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Fresno County Superintendent of Schools
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Mark Siegel
    Counsel of Record
Siegel, Yee, Brunner & Mehta
475 14th Street
Suite 500
Oakland, CA 94612

DanMSiegel@gmail.com
(510) 839-1200
Party name: Aileen Rizo
Other
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Camille A. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
131 South Dearborn Street
Suite 2400
Chicago, IL 60603

colson@seyfarth.com
312-460-5831
Party name: Society for Human Resource Management
Danny E. Petrella
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

dpetrella@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance