No. 19-1158
Title:Airbus Helicopters, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mary Riggs, et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2020
Linked with 19A883
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16396)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2020Application (19A883) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2020 to March 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Application (19A883) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 20, 2020.
Mar 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2020 to May 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 03 2020Motion of respondents Matthew Hecker, et al. to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2020 to May 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2020Motion of Matthew Hecker, et al. to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2020, for all respondents.
Apr 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of The General Aviation Manufacturers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2020Brief of respondents Mary Riggs, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2020Brief of respondents Matthew Hecker, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Airbus Helicopters, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
William James Katt
    Counsel of Record
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
740 North Plankinton Avenue
Suite 600
Milwaukee, WI 53203

william.katt@wilsonelser.com
414-2768816
Party name: Matthew Hecker, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, et al.
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.
455 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 152
Washington, DC 20001

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: Mary Riggs, et al.
Patrick J. KearnsWilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
401 West A Street
Suite 1900
San Diego, CA 92101

patrick.kearns@wilsonelser.com
6193216200
Party name: Matthew Hecker, Daniel Friedman, Brenda Halvorson, et al.
Other
Lauren Lacey Haertlein
    Counsel of Record
General Aviation Manufacturers Association
1400 K St NW. Suite 801
Washington, DC 20005

lhaertlein@GAMA.aero
2023931500
Party name: The General Aviation Manufacturers Association