No. 19-1157
Title:Patsy Weatherly, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pershing, L.L.C.
Docketed:March 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-11052)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Waiver of right of respondent Pershing L.L.C. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 08 2020Response Requested. (Due May 8, 2020)
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2020 to June 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Patsy Weatherly, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian David Schmalzbach
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

bschmalzbach@mcguirewoods.com
8047754746
Party name: Pershing L.L.C.