No. 19-1156
Title:Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Cesar Alcaraz-Enriquez
Docketed:March 20, 2020
Linked with 19A891
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-71553)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2020Application (19A891) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 20, 2020 to March 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Feb 11 2020Application (19A891) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 20, 2020.
Mar 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020)
Petition
Mar 20 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Apr 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2020 to June 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 19, 2020.
Jun 19 2020Brief of respondent Cesar Alcaraz-Enriquez in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 17 2020Reply of petitioner William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1155 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 02 2020As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Oct 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1155. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1155. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 23, 2021. VIDED.
Jan 11 2021Amicus brief of American Immigration Lawyers Association and National Immigrant Justice Center submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2021CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Cesar Alcaraz-Enriquez
Robert Bradford Jobe100 Bush Street
Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94104

bob@jobelaw.com
415-956-5513
Party name: Cesar Alcaraz-Enriquez
Other
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association and National Immigrant Justice Center