No. 19-1154
Title:Robinson Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrew Phillips, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Phillips, et al.
Docketed:March 20, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arkansas
   Case Numbers:(CV-18-45)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2020 to June 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2020.
May 18 2020Brief of respondents Andrew Phillips, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from June 2, 2020 to June 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 29 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 9, 2020, granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: Robinson Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew David Swindle
    Counsel of Record
Reddick Moss, PLLC
One Inofrmation Way, Suite 105
Little Rock, AR 72202

matthew@reddickmoss.com
501-907-7790
Party name: Andrew Phillips, et al.
H. Gregory CampbellCampbell Law Firm, P.A.
2100 Riverdale Road
Suite 200B
Little Rock, AR 72202

greg@gcampbell-law.com
5013725659
Party name: Andrew Phillips, et al.