No. 19-1153
Title:Russell A. Suzuki, et al., Petitioners
v.
Christopher Deedy
Docketed:March 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16632)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2020 to May 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2020.
May 19 2020Brief of respondent Christopher Deedy in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donn Fudo
    Counsel of Record
Department of the Prosecuting Attorney
1060 Richards Street
9th Floor
Honolulu, HI 96813

dfudo@honolulu.gov
8087686535
Party name: Russell A. Suzuki, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Michael Madden
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

mmadden@robbinsrussell.com
2027754500
Party name: Christopher Deedy