No. 19-1147 | |
Title: | Willowood, LLC, et al., Petitioners v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC |
Docketed: | March 19, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2018-1614, 2018-2044) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 17 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 10 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020. |
Apr 23 2020 | Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2020) |
May 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2020 to June 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 18 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2020. |
Jun 25 2020 | Brief of respondent Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 07 2020 | Reply of petitioners Willowood, LLC, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Steven E. Tiller Counsel of Record | Whitefield, Taylor & Preston 7 St. Paul Street Suite 1400 Baltimore, MD 21202 stiller@wtplaw.com | 410-347-9425 |
Party name: Willowood, LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Russell E. Levine Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 300 N. Lasalle Chicago, IL 60654 rlevine@kirkland.com | (312) 862-2000 |
Party name: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC |