No. 19-1145
Title:Ng Lap Seng, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 18, 2020
Linked with 19A704
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1725)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2019Application (19A704) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2020 to February 13, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Application (19A704) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 13, 2020.
Jan 22 2020Application (19A704) to extend further the time from February 13, 2020 to March 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 23 2020Application (19A704) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 14, 2020.
Mar 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020.
Apr 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to June 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 1, 2020.
Jun 01 2020Brief of United States of America in opposition submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 02 2020Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Ng Lap Seng
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America