No. 19-1143
Title:FMC Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Shoshone-Bannock Tribes
Docketed:March 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-35840, 17-35865)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2020 to May 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2020.
Apr 17 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2020Brief of respondent Shoshone-Bannock Tribes in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 09 2020Reply of petitioner FMC Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: FMC Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes
Other
Laura Kathleen McNally
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb, LLP
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

lmcnally@loeb.com
3124643155
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Jeffrey Heath Wood
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
700 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC, DC 20001

jeff.wood@bakerbotts.com
202.639.7732
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Power County Development Authority, and Bannock Development Corporation