No. 19-1141
Title:Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
BP P.L.C., et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2020
Linked with 19A744
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2233)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Application (19A744) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2020 to March 13, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Application (19A744) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 13, 2020.
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2020.
Apr 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Officials of the Commodity Futures Trading Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Toshiba Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 17 2020Brief amici curiae of Better Markets, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Brief of respondents BP p.l.c., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 12, 2020 to May 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 26, 2020, granted.
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
May 26 2020Reply of petitioners Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard C. Pepperman II
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

peppermanr@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4000
Party name: BP p.l.c., et al.
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Former Officials of the Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Paul F. Enzinna
    Counsel of Record
Ellerman Enzinna PLLC
1050 30th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

Penzinna@ellermanenzinna.com
202-753-5553
Party name: Toshiba Corporation
Times Wang
    Counsel of Record
North River Law PLLC
1300 I Street NW
Suite 400 E
Washington, DC 20005

twang@northriverlaw.com
202-838-6489
Party name: Americans for Financial Reform Education Fund / Better Markets
Times Wang
    Counsel of Record
North River Law PLLC
1300 I Street NW
Suite 400E
Washington, DC 20005

twang@northriverlaw.com
202-838-6489
Party name: Better Markets, Inc and Americans for Financial Reform Education Fund