No. 19-1138
Title:DeWayne D. Knight, Petitioner
v.
Thomas Grossman, Jr.
Docketed:March 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1740)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2020 to June 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2020.
Jun 17 2020Brief of respondent Thomas Grossman, Jr., M.D. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020Reply of petitioner DeWayne D. Knight filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Emily Jane Greb
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
33 East Main Street, Suite 201
Madison, WI 53703

EGreb@perkinscoie.com
(608) 663-7460
Party name: DeWayne D. Knight
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason John Franckowiak
    Counsel of Record
Otjen Law Firm, S.C.
20935 Swenson Drive, Suite 310
Waukesha, WI 53186

jfranckowiak@otjen.com
2627772222
Party name: Thomas Grossman, Jr., M.D.