No. 19-1135
Title:Dignity Health, dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center, Petitioner
v.
Evan Minton
Docketed:March 17, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A153662)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 18, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to July 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2020.
Apr 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Catholic Medical Association and National Catholic Bioethics Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Providence St. Joseph Health filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Catholic Health Association of the United States, Alliance for Catholic Health Care filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 15 2020Brief of respondent Evan Minton in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2020Reply of petitioner Dignity Health d/b/a Mercy San Juan Medical Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 21 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Dignity Health d/b/a Mercy San Juan Medical Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2021Supplemental brief of respondent Evan Minton filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Rescheduled.
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Dignity Health d/b/a Mercy San Juan Medical Center
Attorneys for Respondent
Amanda Chloe Goad
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Southern California
1313 West 8th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017

agoad@aclusocal.org
213 977 5218
Party name: Evan Minton
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Catholic Medical Association and National Catholic Bioethics Center
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Mark Edward Chopko
    Counsel of Record
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
2000 K Street N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

mchopko@stradley.com
2024198410
Party name: Catholic Health Association of the United States, Alliance for Catholic Health Care
Jeffry Albin Miller
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
701 B Street, Suite 1900
San Diego, CA 92101

jeff.miller@lewisbrisbois.com
619-699-4971
Party name: Providence St. Joseph Health
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
APT C619
washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
9543289461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty