No. 19-1130
Title:Dale Danielson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-36087)
   Decision Date:December 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2020Motion of respondent Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28, AFL-CIO to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2020 to May 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2020, for all respondents.
May 11 2020Brief of respondent Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28, AFL-CIO in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2020Brief of respondent Governor Jay Inslee; David Schumacher, Director OFM in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Dale Danielson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Patrick Casey Pitts
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

cpitts@altshulerberzon.com
4154217151
Party name: Washington Federation of State Employees, AFSCME Council 28, AFL-CIO
Alicia Orlena Young
    Counsel of Record
Washington Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Stree SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504

alicia.young@atg.wa.gov
360-586-2697
Party name: Governor Jay Inslee; David Schumacher, Director OFM