No. 19-1124
Title:Chrimar Systems, Inc., dba CMS Technologies, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Ale USA Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2420)
   Decision Date:September 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2020Waiver of right of respondents Ale USA Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Naples Roundtable, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Brief amici curiae of National Small Business Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Apr 23 2020Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2020)
May 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Baxter International, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2020Brief of respondent Ale USA Inc., f/k/a Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 29 2020Reply of petitioners Chrimar Systems, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: Chrimar Systems, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Leisa Talbert Peschel
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker LLP
1401 Mckinney Street. Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010

lpeschel@jw.com
713-752-4278
Party name: Ale USA Inc., et al.
Chris CraveyJackson Walker LLP
1401 McKinney Street, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010

ccravey@jw.com
713-752-4247
Party name: Ale USA Inc., et al.
Other
George Clark Summerfield Jr.
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60602

george.summerfield@klgates.com
3128074376
Party name: Baxter International, Inc.
Andrew S. Baluch
    Counsel of Record
Smith Baluch LLP
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 2060
Washington, DC 20003

baluch@smithbaluch.com
2028802397
Party name: The Naples Roundtable, Inc.
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: National Small Business Association, et al.
David P. Swenson
    Counsel of Record
Larkin Hoffman Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.
8300 Norman Center Drive, Suite #1000
Minneapolis, MN 55437

dswenson@larkinhoffman.com
952-896-1533
Party name: US Inventor, Inc.