No. 19-1123
Title:Leo Lech, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chief John A. Jackson, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1051)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Leo Lech, et al.