No. 19-1116
Title:LinkedIn Corporation, Petitioner
v.
hiQ Labs, Inc.
Docketed:March 12, 2020
Linked with 19A819
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16783)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2020Application (19A819) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 23 2020Application (19A819) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 9, 2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, LinkedIn Corporation
Blanket Consent
Apr 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent hiQ Labs, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
Apr 23 2020Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2020)
May 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2020 to June 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2020.
Jun 25 2020Brief of respondent hiQ Labs, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: LinkedIn Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
R. Corey Worcester
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
51 Madison Avenue
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

coreyworcester@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7471
Party name: hiQ Labs, Inc.
Other
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Ave NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Marc RotenbergElectronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1519 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center