No. 19-1115
Title:American Bankers Association, Petitioner
v.
National Credit Union Administration
Docketed:March 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5154, 18-5181)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Iowa Bankers Association et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2020.
Apr 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 11, 2020 to May 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 26, 2020.
May 26 2020Brief of respondent National Credit Union Administration in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: American Bankers Association
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: National Credit Union Administration
Other
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Steven Douglas Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight
800 17th Street, NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20006

steven.gordon@hklaw.com
202-955-3000
Party name: Iowa Bankers Association et al.
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
1745 Shea Center Drive, Suite 400
Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

GERoper@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation